FL H0057 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides requirements relating to interests in certain roads and rights-of-way, competitive solicitations, autocycles & personal delivery devices, equipment displaying flashing lights, motor carrier safety improvements, salvage certificates of title or certificates of destruction, rental vehicle registration, insurance policies & surety bonds, electric vertical takeoff & landing aircraft; annual cap on project contracts, airport restrictions, arbitration of contracts by & membership of State Arbitration Board, Central Florida Expressway Authority, borrow pit operation, toll revenue, TBARTA, Northwest Florida Transportation Corridor Authority, terms of Jacksonville Transportation Authority leases, performance standards for certain extraction locations, & sign permit database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
2021-04-23HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-23HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-20HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021)
2021-04-20HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCS Filed
2021-04-20HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-20HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-24HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-24HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseOriginal reference removed: Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-22HouseCS Filed
2021-02-22HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-02-19HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-01-15HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-12-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1194 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-188
S1500 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1359 (Ch. 2021-237), CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186), SB 1134 (Ch. 2021-187), CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
H389 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
H6015 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S376 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
S422 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
S1670 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
177107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28705705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3370262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34383Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34384Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34388Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343881Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343884Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34389Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Amendment/212831/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Amendment/495985/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Amendment/203019/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057z.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/57/Analyses/h0057z1.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=56835&IsPCB=0&BillId=70009
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60520&IsPCB=0&BillId=70009

Bill Comments

feedback