FL S1126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 15 @ 9:00 am in 412 Knott Building
Hearing: Apr 19 @ 10:00 am in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifying that the Department of Revenue is responsible for a certain transfer from the State Treasury to the General Revenue Fund of a portion of documentary stamp tax distributions credited to the State Transportation Trust Fund; deleting a requirement that the department provide space and video conference capability at each of the department's district offices as an alternative to physical appearance by a person requesting a hearing before the Commercial Motor Vehicle Review Board within the department; requiring the department, when proposing any project on the State Highway System which will close or modify an existing access to an abutting property owner, to provide notice to affected property owners, municipalities, and counties at least 180 days before the design phase of the project is completed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-26SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/24/21, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-10SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1385 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Favorable by Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
335199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback