FL S1030 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to the Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program and funding therefor, respectively; requiring portions of certain annual license tax revenues to be deposited into the General Revenue Fund; revising the period during which certain revenues shall be transferred to Florida's Turnpike Enterprise, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of the Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program and Reversion of Program Funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H763 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S100 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Added to Second Reading Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3391373Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback