FL S0100 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to applications for funding for technical assistance relating to areas in and around a proposed multiuse corridor interchange; requiring that $35 million transferred to Florida's Turnpike Enterprise be used for a specified purpose beginning in a specified fiscal year and annually for up to 30 years thereafter; requiring that certain increased revenues be used to fund specified projects beginning in a specified fiscal year and annually thereafter; requiring the department, in coordination with the Florida Turnpike Enterprise, to evaluate certain roadways for development of specific controlled access facilities and to include such projects in the work program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseIn Messages
2021-03-25SenateImmediately certified
2021-03-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2021-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-25SenateAmendment(s) adopted (527720)
2021-03-25SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-23SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/25/21
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-18SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
2021-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/18/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-03SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-03SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations
2021-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H763 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1030 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3391373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33966Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33968Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Amendment/740874/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Amendment/527720/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Analyses/2021s00100.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Analyses/2021s00100.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Analyses/2021s00100.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Analyses/2021s00100.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/100/Vote/SenateVote_s00100c1010.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback