FL H0763 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to M-CORES Program & related funding; requires portions of certain annual license tax revenues to be deposited into General Revenue Fund; revises period during which certain revenues shall be transferred to Florida's Turnpike Enterprise.
Title
Repeal of the Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program and Reversion of Program Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. Yvonne Hayes Hinson [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1030 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186)
S100 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Chapter No. 2021-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186)
S1126 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-186, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37)
S100 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Chapter No. 2021-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1126 (Ch. 2021-186)
S1126 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-186, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2021-161), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 2278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 1373 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/763 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/763/BillText/Filed/PDF |