FL H1385 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Favorable by Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to transfer of moneys to & from State Transportation Trust Fund; removes requirements related to deduction of service charges; requires DOT to allow person to appear remotely before Commercial Motor Vehicle Review Board via communications media technology; requires DOT to adopt rules to implement airport zoning provisions; requires department, when proposing certain projects on State Highway System, to provide notice to affected property owners, municipalities, & counties; provides public meeting requirements; removes expiration of provisions authorizing LBC to authorize approval of work program amendments; revises date by which M.P.O. must submit list of project priorities to DOT district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-06HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-04-01HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1126 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
S1500 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
335199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback