FL S0660 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation to consist of a central office that establishes policies and procedures and districts that carry out projects as authorized or required under the policies and procedures of the central office; prohibiting the driver of any vehicle from following another vehicle more closely than is reasonable and prudent given certain circumstances; revising the number of times that certain persons may elect to attend a basic driver improvement course; providing requirements, beginning on a specified date, for license plates, cab cards, and validation stickers for vehicles registered in accordance with the International Registration Plan; directing the department to implement protocols for issuing an optional electronic credential and to procure a related technology system, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S662 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S664 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H311 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Chapter No. 2019-101
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
H725 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-149
S898 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
S928 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S932 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101)
H765 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S1044 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S1148 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1158 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
H905 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1057 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-92
H1111 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H6059 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1638 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149)
S7090 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149)
S974 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160899Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback