FL H0725 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting persons who operate a commercial motor vehicle solely in intrastate commerce which does not transport hazardous materials in amounts that require placarding from certain requirements related to electronic logging devices and hours of service supporting documents until a specified date; extending an exemption from specified commercial motor vehicle requirements for a commercial vehicle having a certain gross vehicle weight rating and gross combined weight rating, under certain circumstances; revising length and load extension limitations for stinger-steered automobile transporters, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#371 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#144 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chapter No. 2019-149
2019-06-26 Approved by Governor
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (156244) 1258
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (156244)
2019-05-03SenateMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (375724)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1638
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) adopted (833291)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-29HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-11HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S664 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1638 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149)
S7090 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/Amendment/314759/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/Amendment/833291/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/Vote/HouseVote_h00725c2144.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/Vote/SenateVote_h00725e1016.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/725/Vote/HouseVote_h00725e1371.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback