FL S7090 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring community service in a trauma center or hospital that receives victims of vehicle crashes; requiring that, under a yellow dot program, certain critical medical information be made readily available to responders in the event of a motor vehicle crash; prohibiting certain persons from being liable or at fault regarding the cause of a crash solely by reason of moving a vehicle; adding an operator to persons who may incur serious bodily injury for purposes of a certain penalty, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFiled
2019-04-02SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-21SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S7092 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S7094 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H725 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1269 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S664 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1482 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1638 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 725
S1674 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H385 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3191411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31940Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3208232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3220602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
323002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32840Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32880Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501976Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
856015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback