CA SB1155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 87406 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: postgovernment employment restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 87406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |