CA SB1245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12300.1 and 12309.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-home supportive services: licensed health care professional certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12300.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12309.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |