CA SB1428 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-19 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-19 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 123467.4 and 127698 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to reproductive health.
Title
Reproductive health: mifepristone and other medication.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1428 Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1428 Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3469.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123467.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127698 | New Code | See Bill Text |