WI AB43 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act; Relating to: state finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2023 legislature. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2023 legislature. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-29HouseLaid on the table
2023-06-27HouseReferred to calendar of 6-29-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1)
2023-06-27HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2023-06-27HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2023-06-27HouseReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
2023-06-27HouseExecutive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
2023-06-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2023-06-22HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-06-15HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-06-13HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-06-08HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-06-01HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-25HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-23HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-18HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-16HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-04HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-05-02HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2023-05-02HouseExecutive action taken by joint committee on Finance
2023-04-26HousePublic hearing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-04-12HousePublic hearing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-04-11HousePublic hearing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-04-05HousePublic hearing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-03-30HouseAgency briefing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-03-28HouseAgency briefing held by joint committee on Finance
2023-03-07HouseHousing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes
2023-03-02HouseCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2023-02-15HouseRead first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions
2023-02-15HouseRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback