CA AB2037 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12209.7 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to weights and measures.
Title
Weights and measures: electric vehicle chargers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12209.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |