ME LD2086 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 759 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 759 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Law Governing the Disposition of Forfeited Firearms
Title
An Act to Amend the Law Governing the Disposition of Forfeited Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #759 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #534 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Reconsider RC #523 (Y: 65 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #522 (Y: 74 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #521 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #709 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #534 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Reconsider RC #523 (Y: 65 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #522 (Y: 74 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #521 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #709 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 759 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 534 (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 523 (Yeas 66 - Nays 78 - Absent 6 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-679) FAILED. |
2024-04-16 | House | In concurrence. |
2024-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 522 (Yeas 74 - Nays 72 - Absent 4 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-679). |
2024-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-679) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 521 (Yeas 73 - Nays 72 - Absent 5 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-679) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-679) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 709 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-03-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |