PA HB2084 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-16 - Act No. 101 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 14, 1992 (P.L.1116, No.145), known as the Wholesale Prescription Drug Distributors License Act, further providing for definitions, for license application and for storage, handling and recordkeeping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for license application and for storage, handling and recordkeeping.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-10-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2084 PN 2818, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2084 PN 2818, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03752 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-10-16SenateAct No. 101 of 2024
2024-10-16SenateApproved by the Governor
2024-10-10SenatePresented to the Governor
2024-10-09SenateSigned in Senate
2024-10-09SenateSigned in House
2024-10-09SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2024-10-07SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-10-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-10-07SenateSecond consideration
2024-10-01SenateFirst consideration
2024-10-01SenateReported as committed
2024-05-17SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2024-04-29SenateIn the Senate
2024-04-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2024-04-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-04-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-04-17HouseSecond consideration
2024-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2024-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2024-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2024-03-27HouseReported as amended
2024-03-06HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2084
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2084&pn=2665
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2084&pn=2818
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2084&pn=2665&aYear=2023&an=03752
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB2084P2818.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB2084P2818.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1483
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/27/2024&RollCallId=1484
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1062
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=04/29/2024&RollCallId=1633
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=10/01/2024&RollCallId=1293
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/07/2024&RollCallId=1316
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=684

Bill Comments

feedback