FL H0385 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - CS passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain authority or agency members to comply with financial disclosure requirements; revises authorized uses of certain surtaxes; revives Pilot Rebuilt motor vehicle inspection program; revises provisions relating to DOT design plan approval, transportation project programs, toll collection & use, & M.P.O. membership; repeals Florida Expressway Authority Act & Osceola County Expressway Authority Law; creates Greater Miami Expressway Agency Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#145 (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 33
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) adopted (023753, 102261, 155489, 253139, 356997, 367595, 410231, 432313, 442917, 556307, 679301, 703161, 754395)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-08HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-07HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/06/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-20HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-02-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S660 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
S898 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
S928 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
H6059 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H905 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
S1044 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
H7021 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
S7090 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1123144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339176Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3431003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34800115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3487605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489950Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489954Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489956Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489957Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489958Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489959Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489961Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/809839/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/868935/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/671311/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/432313/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/023753/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/367595/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/703161/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/102261/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/410231/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/556307/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/679301/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/356997/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/155489/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/442917/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/754395/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Amendment/253139/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/385/Vote/HouseVote_h00385c3145.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback