FL S1044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting local governments from adopting standards or specifications that are contrary to the department standards or specifications for permissible use of aggregates that have been certified for use; authorizing the department to establish a program for transportation projects that demonstrate certain innovative techniques for measuring resiliency and structural integrity and controlling time and cost increases; increasing the maximum amounts per contract of certain contractual claims that must be arbitrated by the State Arbitration Board under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 905
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-03-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S898 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
H905 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334179Amended CodeSee Bill Text
336044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33718Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33965Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback