CA AB1849 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1791 and 1793.2 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer warranties.
Title
Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act: services and repairs: travel trailers and motor homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-12 - Assembly - AB 1849 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1849 Grayson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1849 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1849 Grayson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1849 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6266.). |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5295.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1791 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1793.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |