FL H0637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Fallen Hero Specialist Kelly J. Mixon Intersection in Nassau County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169) |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S100 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/637 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/637/BillText/Filed/PDF |