FL S0100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/13/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H295 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H637 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S872 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S942 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1688 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
H637 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S872 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S942 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S1688 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)