FL S7092 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that costs incurred by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to obtain a certain order be charged to a subpoenaed person; requiring a specified fee for certain validation stickers; requiring that costs incurred by the department to obtain a certain order be charged to a subpoenaed person, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFiled
2019-04-02SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-21SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S7090 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback