FL H0311 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts autonomous vehicles & operators from certain prohibitions; provides that human operator is not required to operate fully autonomous vehicle; authorizes fully autonomous vehicle to operate regardless of presence of human operator; provides that automated driving system is deemed operator of autonomous vehicle operating with system engaged; authorizes Florida Turnpike Enterprise to fund & operate test facilities; provides requirements for operation of on-demand autonomous vehicle networks; revises registration requirements for autonomous vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6003 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Now in Appropriations Committee
S660 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
S932 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33964Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback