FL H6003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/23/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 @ 1:30 pm in Reed Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program & authorization to use traffic infraction detectors; repeals provisions relating to distribution of penalties, transitional implementation, & placement & installation; conforms cross-references & provisions to changes made by act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Infraction Detectors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/23/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S306 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - Filed
H311 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2837Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31600831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31607456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160776Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
318121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback