CA SB1441 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7924.110 of the Government Code, relating to petitions.
Title
Examination of petitions: time limitations and reimbursement of costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Allen By Umberg (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Allen By Umberg (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 7). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ELECTIONS. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4097.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3631.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3449.) (April 2). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7924.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |