FL S1104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing fleet companies to purchase specialty license plates in lieu of standard fleet license plates; allowing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to authorize dealer and fleet specialty license plates; directing the department to audit certain organizations that receive funds from the sale of specialty license plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-04SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1106 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H199 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H273 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S480 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S484 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1686 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1225 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S106 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S140 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S808 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1060 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1376 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1654 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H201 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S620 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback