FL H0765 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Pending: House Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DHSMV to establish online verification system for motor vehicle insurance; provides system requirements; provides requirements for insurers & law enforcement officers; prohibits use of online verification request or response for civil action; creates Motor Vehicle Insurance Online Verification Task Force; authorizes motor vehicle policies to exclude named individuals from coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseCS referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-03-14HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H173 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S660 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
S1158 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
H1057 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Now in State Affairs Committee
S1052 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627747Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback