MA S681 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2469

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote access to debt-free public higher education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting access to debt-free public higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2469
2017-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University
2017-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School
2017-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S672 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S704 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S667 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H638 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H635 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H633 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4512
H1434 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3553 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
S2469 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback