MA S285 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to safety and violence education for students (the SAVE Students Act). Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to safety and violence education for students (the SAVE Students Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2022 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H821 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S519 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1513 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S261 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2098 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2121 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2040 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2248 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback