MA H2022 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require safety training for operators of jet skis, surf jets or wetbikes. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to jet ski safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2129 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback