MA S2137 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2806
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to strengthening public safety through interlock devices. Transportation.
Title
Relative to strengthening public safety through interlock devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2806 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2957 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1378 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2806 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1378 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2806 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2137 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2137.pdf |