MA S1513 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the appointment and reappointment of certain public safety officers. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the appointment and reappointment of public safety officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4273 (Similar To) 2019-12-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback