MA S1378 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2565

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to traffic and pedestrian stop data. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to traffic and pedestrian stop data

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2565
2019-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2204 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2214
S2214 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback