MA S2121 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to pedestrian safety. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pedestrian safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2022 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S519 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1513 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2098 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1436 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2040 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S669 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2433 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback