MA S2762 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2878
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vacancies on the city of Lowell city council and school committee. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to vacancies on the city of Lowell city council and school committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2878 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Notice Section |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2024 from 01:00 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-05-06 | House | House concurred |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H482 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2058 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2024
S421 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2878 (Replaced by) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
H2058 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2024
S421 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2878 (Replaced by) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2762 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2762.pdf |