MA H482 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4584

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to school committee oversight of courses of study including courses concerning sexually transmitted infections. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school committee oversight

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4584
2023-09-20JointHearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 02:00 PM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S421 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2058 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2024
S2762 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4584 (Replaced by) 2024-05-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4683 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback