MA S2878 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vacancies on the city of Lowell city council and school committee (Senate, No. 2762).
Title
Relative to vacancies on the city of Lowell city council and school committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-07-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-07-24 | House | Enacted |
2024-07-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2024-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-07-24 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-07-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2762 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Recommended new draft (E. Kennedy) for S2762 |
Same As/Similar To
S2762 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2878
H4683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H482 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2058 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2024
S421 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H482 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2058 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2024
S421 (Similar To) 2023-10-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2878 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2878.pdf |