MA S1901 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2387

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the use of road flaggers and police details on public works projects. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of road flaggers and police details on public works projects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2387
2015-10-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1803 (Similar To) 2016-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2236
S1723 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1309 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1190 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H218 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S150 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S1013 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1856 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
S933 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback