MA S150 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2124

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to maintain public water systems. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To maintain public water systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-04SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2124
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2124 (Replaced by) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 363 of the Acts of 2016
S100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H218 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1106 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1397 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1621 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S659 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S1837 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback