MA H218 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2124

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt certain persons experienced in performing sprinkler fitting from sprinkler fitters’ examining and licensing requirements. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To maintain public water systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-04SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2124
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/2/2015
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2124 (Replaced by) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 363 of the Acts of 2016
S150 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S2415 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Reprinted as amended, see S2433
S1595 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H3961 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback