MA S1013 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4605

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide a safe harbor for contractors of services. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a safe harbor for contractors of services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4605
2015-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S340 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
S1889 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1709 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1031 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1123 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1221 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1386 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback