MA S1818 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to bicycle visibility on the road. Transportation.
Title
Relative to bicycle safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2387 |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2941 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S762 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S256 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2941 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S762 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S256 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1818 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1818.pdf |