MA S933 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to sexually violent predators. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sexually violent predators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S915 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S927 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S931 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S802 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S811 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S894 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S895 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S775 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S792 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S816 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1292 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback