MA S1627 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to neighborhood stabilization and economic development. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to neighborhood stabilization and economic development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S324 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S814 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H190 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
S817 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2187 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2189 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1223 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2221 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - House concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
H4070 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
H4179 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Passed to be engrossed - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 124)

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback