MA S1591 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to eligibility to become a firefighter or police officer. Public Service.
Title
Relative to eligibility to become a firefighter or police officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2957 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1378 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S52 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied S61
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1378 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S52 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied S61
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1591 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1591.pdf |