MA S1570 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to fire safety education in schools and colleges. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fire safety education in schools and colleges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2434 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S789 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1640 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S823 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H561 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2559 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S849 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S850 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S275 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S99 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S320 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S323 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback