MA S1444 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public higher education campus police officers injured in the line of duty. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public higher education campus police officers injured in the line of duty
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1817 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1817 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1444 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1444.pdf |