MA S1163 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to employee resignation. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to employee resignation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2691 |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1180 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1704 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2653
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2589 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2581 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1180 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1704 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2653
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2589 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2581 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1163 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1163.pdf |