MA S2527 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2508
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Li Zhang, an employee of the Department of Unemployment Assistance, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2527).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Li Zang, an employee of the Department of Unemployment Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2021-09-13 | Senate | New draft of S2508 |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2508 (Replaces) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
H3927 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1163 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
H3927 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1163 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2527 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2527.pdf |