MA S6 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Alexis Orloff, an employee of the Worcester County Sheriff’s Office. Temporary Senate Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Alexis Orloff, an employee of the Worcester County Sheriff’s Office

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
2021-01-25SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-01-25HouseEnacted
2021-01-25SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-01-25HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-01-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-01-21SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2021-01-19SenateReferred to the committee on Temporary Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3904 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - Senate concurred
H3704 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3769
H3927 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
H3992 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4064
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2777 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback